SARIKA SHAW
Sarika Shaw is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sarika Shaw is 00571769.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sarika Shaw
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SRADDHA CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2002 | Active | Director | 20 February 2002 | 27 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
LANDMARK COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 1997 | Active | Director | 4 September 2007 | 11 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sarika Shaw are Rajeev Kumar Shaw.
FAQ - Sarika Shaw
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sarika Shaw serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sarika Shaw?
The DIN of Sarika Shaw is 00571769.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sarika Shaw?
The longest directorship of Sarika Shaw is with SRADDHA CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More