SARIKA SANKHWAL GARG
Sarika Sankhwal Garg is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sarika Sankhwal Garg is 08523585.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Health and Social Work, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sarika Sankhwal Garg
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TAVE HEALTHCARE LLP | Health and Social Work | 2019 | Active | Director | 30 July 2019 | 31 July 2019 | Buy financial reports |
Sarika Fine Jewellery LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 2 February 2023 | 3 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sarika Sankhwal Garg are Deepak Garg.
FAQ - Sarika Sankhwal Garg
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sarika Sankhwal Garg serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sarika Sankhwal Garg?
The DIN of Sarika Sankhwal Garg is 08523585.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sarika Sankhwal Garg?
The longest directorship of Sarika Sankhwal Garg is with TAVE HEALTHCARE LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More