SARAVJIT KUMAR
Saravjit Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Saravjit Kumar is 08984661.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Health and Social Work, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Saravjit Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANJU DEVI MICRO WELFARE FOUNDATION | Health and Social Work | 2020 | Active | Director | 10 December 2020 | 29 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
PARIHAR INDIA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 30 March 2021 | 13 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Saravjit Kumar are Anju Devi, Nagendra Mandal.
FAQ - Saravjit Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Saravjit Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Saravjit Kumar?
The DIN of Saravjit Kumar is 08984661.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Saravjit Kumar?
The longest directorship of Saravjit Kumar is with ANJU DEVI MICRO WELFARE FOUNDATION.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More