SANWAR MAL
Sanwar Mal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sanwar Mal is 08167973.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sanwar Mal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURYADARSHAN AYURVEDA PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 7 August 2018 | 31 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
TRUELIFE WELLNESS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 29 May 2021 | 1 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sanwar Mal are Mahendra Kumar Rao, Seema Devi.
FAQ - Sanwar Mal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sanwar Mal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sanwar Mal?
The DIN of Sanwar Mal is 08167973.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sanwar Mal?
The longest directorship of Sanwar Mal is with SURYADARSHAN AYURVEDA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More