SANJOY DASS
Sanjoy Dass is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sanjoy Dass is 08834063.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sanjoy Dass
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAMSA TECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 1 February 2021 | 25 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
IKIVA PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 14 August 2020 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sanjoy Dass are Gaurav Agarwal, Amit Kumar Goyal, Ajey Mehta.
FAQ - Sanjoy Dass
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sanjoy Dass serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sanjoy Dass?
The DIN of Sanjoy Dass is 08834063.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sanjoy Dass?
The longest directorship of Sanjoy Dass is with IKIVA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More