SANDEEP KUSHWAHA
Sandeep Kushwaha is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sandeep Kushwaha is 08787621.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sandeep Kushwaha
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SRI SRIJANSEVA NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 28 December 2021 | 8 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
SRIJANSEVA GRAMIN NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 9 July 2020 | 10 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sandeep Kushwaha are Rakesh Kumar, Shailesh Kushwaha, Roshan Lal Gupta.
FAQ - Sandeep Kushwaha
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sandeep Kushwaha serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sandeep Kushwaha?
The DIN of Sandeep Kushwaha is 08787621.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sandeep Kushwaha?
The longest directorship of Sandeep Kushwaha is with SRIJANSEVA GRAMIN NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More