SANDEEP KUMAR JAIN
Sandeep Kumar Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sandeep Kumar Jain is 08312150.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sandeep Kumar Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CORNER TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 28 August 2021 | 5 May 2022 | Buy financial reports |
OASIS VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2006 | Active | Director | 17 February 2022 | 17 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sandeep Kumar Jain are Seema Jain.
FAQ - Sandeep Kumar Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sandeep Kumar Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sandeep Kumar Jain?
The DIN of Sandeep Kumar Jain is 08312150.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sandeep Kumar Jain?
The longest directorship of Sandeep Kumar Jain is with CORNER TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More