SAJAL SAHA
Sajal Saha is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Sajal Saha is 03101693.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Sajal Saha
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADLOG INFRATECH LIMITED | Construction | 2011 | Active | Director | 5 April 2011 | 15 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
ADLOG MICRO FINANCE | Finance | 2011 | Active | Director | 25 June 2011 | 18 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Sajal Saha are Biswanath Dhali, Niladri Sekhar Nag, Dilip Sharma.
FAQ - Sajal Saha
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Sajal Saha serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Sajal Saha?
The DIN of Sajal Saha is 03101693.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Sajal Saha?
The longest directorship of Sajal Saha is with ADLOG INFRATECH LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More