SAIREKA
Saireka is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Saireka is 06570825.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Health and Social Work etc.
Following are the directorship details of Saireka
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WEBZONE MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 12 March 2018 | 31 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
AHSAN SOCIAL FOUNDATION | Health and Social Work | 2019 | Active | Director | 13 February 2019 | 8 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Saireka are Noor Ahsan.
FAQ - Saireka
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Saireka serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Saireka?
The DIN of Saireka is 06570825.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Saireka?
The longest directorship of Saireka is with WEBZONE MEDIA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More