RUBIN FAHEEM
Rubin Faheem is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Rubin Faheem is 08398353.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Rubin Faheem
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RF MOBIKES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2007 | Active | Director | 15 January 2019 | 10 March 2024 | Buy financial reports |
R F MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2004 | Active | Director | 10 April 2019 | 23 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Rubin Faheem are Pudussary Abdul Bashir Faheem.
FAQ - Rubin Faheem
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Rubin Faheem serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Rubin Faheem?
The DIN of Rubin Faheem is 08398353.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Rubin Faheem?
The longest directorship of Rubin Faheem is with RF MOBIKES (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More