RITIKA GUPTA
Ritika Gupta is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ritika Gupta is 07872336.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ritika Gupta
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RS RISO INDIA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2017 | Active | Director | 18 July 2017 | 17 December 2021 | Buy financial reports |
AHUSONS FINANCE AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LTD | Business Services | 1987 | Active | Director | 1 June 2019 | 18 March 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ritika Gupta are Vaibbhav Gupta.
FAQ - Ritika Gupta
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ritika Gupta serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ritika Gupta?
The DIN of Ritika Gupta is 07872336.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ritika Gupta?
The longest directorship of Ritika Gupta is with RS RISO INDIA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More