RITA SHARMA
Rita Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Rita Sharma is 02268842.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Rita Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SNA FINVEST PVT LTD | Finance | 1996 | Active | Director | 18 August 2008 | 26 May 2022 | Buy financial reports |
VANGUARD TRADEWINGS PVT LTD | Trading | 1996 | Active | Director | 19 January 2012 | 22 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Rita Sharma are Sunil Kumar Sharma, Abhishek Shoparna, Nidhi Shoparna.
FAQ - Rita Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Rita Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Rita Sharma?
The DIN of Rita Sharma is 02268842.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Rita Sharma?
The longest directorship of Rita Sharma is with SNA FINVEST PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More