REENA SINGH
Reena Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Reena Singh is 07068784.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Reena Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHREESIDDHIVINAYAK MEDITECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2013 | Under Process of Striking Off | Director | 2 January 2015 | 15 March 2021 | Buy financial reports |
SHREESIDDHIVINAYAK INFRA-ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2017 | Active | Director | 1 May 2020 | 2 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Reena Singh are Girdhari Singh.
FAQ - Reena Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Reena Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Reena Singh?
The DIN of Reena Singh is 07068784.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Reena Singh?
The longest directorship of Reena Singh is with SHREESIDDHIVINAYAK MEDITECH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More