REDDEM ARUNA
Reddem Aruna is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Reddem Aruna is 05209918.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Reddem Aruna
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RNR SQUARE LLP | Construction | 2020 | Active | Director | 17 March 2020 | 18 March 2020 | Buy financial reports |
RNR FACILITIES PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2012 | Active | Director | 15 March 2012 | 7 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Reddem Aruna are Nagi Reddy Reddem.
FAQ - Reddem Aruna
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Reddem Aruna serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Reddem Aruna?
The DIN of Reddem Aruna is 05209918.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Reddem Aruna?
The longest directorship of Reddem Aruna is with RNR FACILITIES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More