RAM AUTAR AGRWAL
Ram Autar Agrwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Ram Autar Agrwal is 00589812.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Ram Autar Agrwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BUDDHA MEDICO PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2012 | Active | Director | 20 January 2012 | 28 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
BUDDHA INNOVATION PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 22 March 2021 | 30 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Ram Autar Agrwal are Rashmi Agrawal, Rajat Agarwal.
FAQ - Ram Autar Agrwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Ram Autar Agrwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Ram Autar Agrwal?
The DIN of Ram Autar Agrwal is 00589812.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Ram Autar Agrwal?
The longest directorship of Ram Autar Agrwal is with BUDDHA MEDICO PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More