RAKESH VERMA
Rakesh Verma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Rakesh Verma is 02979162.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Rakesh Verma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURETY SERVICES (OPC) PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2016 | Active | Director | 30 June 2016 | 28 May 2021 | Buy financial reports |
FAB SERVICES AND TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Under Process of Striking Off | Director | 1 April 2010 | 11 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Rakesh Verma are Kamal Preet Verma.
FAQ - Rakesh Verma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Rakesh Verma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Rakesh Verma?
The DIN of Rakesh Verma is 02979162.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Rakesh Verma?
The longest directorship of Rakesh Verma is with FAB SERVICES AND TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More