RAJKISHOR SINGH
Rajkishor Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Rajkishor Singh is 08115548.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Rajkishor Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IGNITE EDUCARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2018 | Active | Director | 20 April 2018 | 2 September 2021 | Buy financial reports |
JUNO BIOTECH INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 24 August 2021 | 6 August 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Rajkishor Singh are Sushila Devi, Shrawan Kumar Singh.
FAQ - Rajkishor Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Rajkishor Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Rajkishor Singh?
The DIN of Rajkishor Singh is 08115548.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Rajkishor Singh?
The longest directorship of Rajkishor Singh is with IGNITE EDUCARE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More