RAJESH KUMAR
Rajesh Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Rajesh Kumar is 09075690.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Rajesh Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAMINUTHAN NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 22 February 2021 | 1 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
GRAMINUTHAN URBAN NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2021 | Active | Director | 3 May 2021 | 7 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Rajesh Kumar are Aashutosh Pathak, Shantani Kumari, Raushan Kumar.
FAQ - Rajesh Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Rajesh Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Rajesh Kumar?
The DIN of Rajesh Kumar is 09075690.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Rajesh Kumar?
The longest directorship of Rajesh Kumar is with GRAMINUTHAN NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More