RAHUL BOHRA
Rahul Bohra is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Rahul Bohra is 00451630.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 4 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, Finance, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Rahul Bohra
NAME | INDUSTRY | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HOME TELEVISION NETWORK PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | Director | 9 April 2016 | Buy financial reports |
CATAMOUNT CORPS AND MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | Director | 23 August 2018 | Buy financial reports |
NANDWANA FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED | Finance | Director | 30 September 2005 | Buy financial reports |
HOVIKA INFRATRADE LLP | Director | 19 June 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Rahul Bohra are:
NAME | DIN (Director Identification Number) |
---|---|
Akshay Nandwana | 00451520 |
Ram Charan Bohra | 00451868 |
Pawan Nahata | 00942011 |
Yugal Kishore Sharma | 02667006 |
Atul Joshi | 06956421 |
Avadhesh Bhardwaj | 06956440 |
Mukesh Ahuja | 06956447 |
Shailendra Kumar Shah | 06956451 |
Kedar Sharma | 07487107 |
Manisha Sharma | 07515244 |
Pooran Mal Sharma | 08189439 |
Mahesh Sharma | 08205545 |
Jai Shah | 10206200 |
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More