PUSHPA SINGH
Pushpa Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Pushpa Singh is 08678373.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Pushpa Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VASM AYURVEDA PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 24 January 2020 | 6 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
VASM ADVERTISING PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2017 | Active | Director | 13 April 2021 | 20 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Pushpa Singh are Anil Kumar, Santosh Kumar Dwivedi.
FAQ - Pushpa Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Pushpa Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Pushpa Singh?
The DIN of Pushpa Singh is 08678373.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Pushpa Singh?
The longest directorship of Pushpa Singh is with VASM AYURVEDA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More