PREETI SINGH
Preeti Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Preeti Singh is 07153823.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Preeti Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REAL VALUE EXPORT PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2002 | Active | Director | 1 December 2017 | 6 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
OMBL INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2013 | Active | Director | 10 April 2015 | 20 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Preeti Singh are Vineet Kumar.
FAQ - Preeti Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Preeti Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Preeti Singh?
The DIN of Preeti Singh is 07153823.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Preeti Singh?
The longest directorship of Preeti Singh is with OMBL INFRAPROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More