PRAVEEN JAIN
Praveen Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Praveen Jain is 01298317.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Praveen Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AADEE INDIA LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 19 October 2020 | 19 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
AKASH PAPERBOARD PVT LTD | Business Services | 1999 | Active | Director | 10 August 1999 | 30 June 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Praveen Jain are Pooja Jain, Aakash Jain, Disha Jain.
FAQ - Praveen Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Praveen Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Praveen Jain?
The DIN of Praveen Jain is 01298317.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Praveen Jain?
The longest directorship of Praveen Jain is with AKASH PAPERBOARD PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More