PRAHLAD SINGH HIRANWAL
Prahlad Singh Hiranwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Prahlad Singh Hiranwal is 06573486.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Prahlad Singh Hiranwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARANGANJALI REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2013 | Active | Director | 11 July 2013 | 29 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
TARPL NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2019 | Active | Director | 12 June 2019 | 4 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Prahlad Singh Hiranwal are Geeta Hiranwal, Pradeep Kumar.
FAQ - Prahlad Singh Hiranwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Prahlad Singh Hiranwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Prahlad Singh Hiranwal?
The DIN of Prahlad Singh Hiranwal is 06573486.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Prahlad Singh Hiranwal?
The longest directorship of Prahlad Singh Hiranwal is with TARANGANJALI REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More