POOJA CHANDRA
Pooja Chandra is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Pooja Chandra is 03247332.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Pooja Chandra
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FOREC EDUCARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2011 | Active | Director | 9 February 2011 | 5 April 2018 | Buy financial reports |
FOREC SNAPP INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2013 | Active | Director | 26 April 2013 | 6 August 2019 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Pooja Chandra are Neena Chandra, Payal Chandra.
FAQ - Pooja Chandra
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Pooja Chandra serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Pooja Chandra?
The DIN of Pooja Chandra is 03247332.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Pooja Chandra?
The longest directorship of Pooja Chandra is with FOREC EDUCARE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More