PIYUSH KASAT
Piyush Kasat is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Piyush Kasat is 05311811.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Mining and Quarrying etc.
Following are the directorship details of Piyush Kasat
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THAR MARMO PRIVATE LIMITED | Mining and Quarrying | 2005 | Active | Director | 1 March 2012 | 29 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
THAR STONEX PRIVATE LIMITED | Mining and Quarrying | 2007 | Active | Director | 1 December 2015 | 24 November 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Piyush Kasat are Om Prakash Kasat, Ramesh Kumar Kasat.
FAQ - Piyush Kasat
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Piyush Kasat serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Piyush Kasat?
The DIN of Piyush Kasat is 05311811.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Piyush Kasat?
The longest directorship of Piyush Kasat is with THAR MARMO PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More