PAWAN KUMAR MAHTO
Pawan Kumar Mahto is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Pawan Kumar Mahto is 08605775.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Pawan Kumar Mahto
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZENETIC ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 7 November 2019 | 28 October 2020 | Buy financial reports |
AGPM ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 19 February 2021 | 16 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Pawan Kumar Mahto are Vikas Gupta, Hemant Singh.
FAQ - Pawan Kumar Mahto
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Pawan Kumar Mahto serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Pawan Kumar Mahto?
The DIN of Pawan Kumar Mahto is 08605775.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Pawan Kumar Mahto?
The longest directorship of Pawan Kumar Mahto is with ZENETIC ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More