NUTAN JAIN
Nutan Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Nutan Jain is 01114191.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Nutan Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KUMAR ELECTCON PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2005 | Active | Director | 16 March 2005 | 22 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
KUMAR POWERTECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2008 | Active | Director | 15 June 2010 | 23 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Nutan Jain are Ashok Kumar Jain.
FAQ - Nutan Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Nutan Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Nutan Jain?
The DIN of Nutan Jain is 01114191.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Nutan Jain?
The longest directorship of Nutan Jain is with KUMAR ELECTCON PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More