NITIN TYAGI
Nitin Tyagi is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Nitin Tyagi is 08656483.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Nitin Tyagi
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J-BANS INTENSIVE CARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2018 | Active | Director | 31 December 2019 | 2 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
J-BANS ICU CARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2020 | Active | Director | 28 November 2020 | 1 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Nitin Tyagi are Himanshu Tyagi, Shaishav Mittal, Chavi Mittal.
FAQ - Nitin Tyagi
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Nitin Tyagi serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Nitin Tyagi?
The DIN of Nitin Tyagi is 08656483.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Nitin Tyagi?
The longest directorship of Nitin Tyagi is with J-BANS INTENSIVE CARE PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More