NITIN KANODIA
Nitin Kanodia is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Nitin Kanodia is 00875046.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Nitin Kanodia
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVERY INVESTMENT CO PVT LTD | Finance | 1983 | Active | Director | 9 May 1994 | 14 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
RVP TRADING AND AGENCIES LIMITED | Trading | 1984 | Active | Director | 30 May 2019 | 6 June 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Nitin Kanodia are Ramavatar Agarwal, Pankaj Mansingka, Krishan Kumar Mansinghka.
FAQ - Nitin Kanodia
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Nitin Kanodia serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Nitin Kanodia?
The DIN of Nitin Kanodia is 00875046.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Nitin Kanodia?
The longest directorship of Nitin Kanodia is with AVERY INVESTMENT CO PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More