NIRAJ JAISWAL
Niraj Jaiswal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Niraj Jaiswal is 08403353.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education etc.
Following are the directorship details of Niraj Jaiswal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENEDICTION EDUCATION SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2019 | Active | Director | 28 March 2019 | 18 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
BISHOP GEORGE FOUNDATION | Education | 2019 | Active | Director | 1 July 2019 | 19 February 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Niraj Jaiswal are Bhawna Jaiswal.
FAQ - Niraj Jaiswal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Niraj Jaiswal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Niraj Jaiswal?
The DIN of Niraj Jaiswal is 08403353.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Niraj Jaiswal?
The longest directorship of Niraj Jaiswal is with BENEDICTION EDUCATION SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More