NILESH JAIN
Nilesh Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Nilesh Jain is 02294207.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Nilesh Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N BABULAL AND COMPANY PVT LTD | Trading | 1993 | Active | Director | 25 November 2002 | 9 July 2022 | Buy financial reports |
KSHIR SAGAR CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 1988 | Active | Director | 30 June 2007 | 27 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Nilesh Jain are Sumeet Kamlesh Jain.
FAQ - Nilesh Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Nilesh Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Nilesh Jain?
The DIN of Nilesh Jain is 02294207.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Nilesh Jain?
The longest directorship of Nilesh Jain is with N BABULAL AND COMPANY PVT LTD.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More