NEHA MAHTO
Neha Mahto is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Neha Mahto is 06757424.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as , Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Neha Mahto
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MERAKI IN WOODS LLP | 2022 | Active | Director | 25 May 2022 | 13 June 2022 | Buy financial reports | |
SHIRIN HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2013 | Active | Director | 30 December 2013 | 5 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Neha Mahto are Nilay Mehta, Kushagra Mahansaria.
FAQ - Neha Mahto
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Neha Mahto serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Neha Mahto?
The DIN of Neha Mahto is 06757424.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Neha Mahto?
The longest directorship of Neha Mahto is with SHIRIN HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More