NANDAGOPAL VELUMANI
Nandagopal Velumani is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Nandagopal Velumani is 08197464.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education etc.
Following are the directorship details of Nandagopal Velumani
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SASHWAM VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED | Education | 2020 | Active | Director | 26 May 2020 | 14 March 2023 | Buy financial reports |
SHIKSHANTARA FOUNDATION | Education | 2018 | Active | Director | 9 August 2018 | 7 February 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Nandagopal Velumani are Shrinithi.
FAQ - Nandagopal Velumani
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Nandagopal Velumani serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Nandagopal Velumani?
The DIN of Nandagopal Velumani is 08197464.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Nandagopal Velumani?
The longest directorship of Nandagopal Velumani is with SHIKSHANTARA FOUNDATION.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More