MUKESH KUMAR
Mukesh Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Mukesh Kumar is 07827186.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Mukesh Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASHURAMA ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2017 | Active | Director | 13 June 2017 | 14 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
SWANSGREEN BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2019 | Active | Director | 23 January 2020 | 15 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Mukesh Kumar are Krishna Prasad, Sumit Kumar, Kumar Rajeev Ranjan.
FAQ - Mukesh Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Mukesh Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Mukesh Kumar?
The DIN of Mukesh Kumar is 07827186.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Mukesh Kumar?
The longest directorship of Mukesh Kumar is with PASHURAMA ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More