MUKESH KUMAR AGARWAL
Mukesh Kumar Agarwal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Mukesh Kumar Agarwal is 01174126.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Mukesh Kumar Agarwal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SRILEKHA MERCANTILES PVT. LTD. | Trading | 1993 | Active | Director | 3 November 1993 | 26 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
CHANDRANIDHI EXPORTS PVT.LTD. | Trading | 1993 | Active | Director | 20 October 1994 | 3 December 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Mukesh Kumar Agarwal are Mahesh Kumar Agarwalla.
FAQ - Mukesh Kumar Agarwal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Mukesh Kumar Agarwal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Mukesh Kumar Agarwal?
The DIN of Mukesh Kumar Agarwal is 01174126.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Mukesh Kumar Agarwal?
The longest directorship of Mukesh Kumar Agarwal is with SRILEKHA MERCANTILES PVT. LTD..
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More