. MOUMITA RAHA
. Moumita Raha is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of . Moumita Raha is 07480044.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of . Moumita Raha
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BIJALPO INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2016 | Active | Director | 28 April 2016 | 20 April 2022 | Buy financial reports |
FRONTIER SHIPPING SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2023 | Not available for efiling | Director | 8 June 2023 | 9 June 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with . Moumita Raha are Jnnanankur Nag.
FAQ - . Moumita Raha
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
. Moumita Raha serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of . Moumita Raha?
The DIN of . Moumita Raha is 07480044.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of . Moumita Raha?
The longest directorship of . Moumita Raha is with BIJALPO INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More