MONICA SHARMA
Monica Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Monica Sharma is 09273052.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Monica Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THM DESIIGNZ PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2021 | Active | Director | 6 August 2021 | 7 August 2021 | Buy financial reports |
LIVELLO HOME LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 31 May 2023 | 2 June 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Monica Sharma are Meenakshi Chauhan, Hemant Kumar Sharma.
FAQ - Monica Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Monica Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Monica Sharma?
The DIN of Monica Sharma is 09273052.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Monica Sharma?
The longest directorship of Monica Sharma is with THM DESIIGNZ PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More