MONI
Moni is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Moni is 05149715.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Moni
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
INDIAMIN IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2012 | Active | Director | 18 July 2012 | 4 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
LAXMI KRIPA ACCOMODATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED | Construction | 2006 | Active | Director | 22 February 2006 | 2 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Moni are Mahima Thakur, Sidharth Singh.
FAQ - Moni
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Moni serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Moni?
The DIN of Moni is 05149715.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Moni?
The longest directorship of Moni is with LAXMI KRIPA ACCOMODATIONS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More