MOHAN
Mohan is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Mohan is 09035052.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction etc.
Following are the directorship details of Mohan
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THARWANI INFRASTRUCTURE LLP | Construction | 2021 | Active | Director | 25 January 2021 | 31 January 2021 | Buy financial reports |
SQYLINES BUILDLERS LLP | Construction | 2021 | Active | Director | 11 November 2021 | 12 November 2021 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Mohan are Mokshay Pradeep Sadhwani, Kunal Tharwani.
FAQ - Mohan
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Mohan serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Mohan?
The DIN of Mohan is 09035052.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Mohan?
The longest directorship of Mohan is with THARWANI INFRASTRUCTURE LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More