MITHLESH SHARMA
Mithlesh Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Mithlesh Sharma is 08214169.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Mithlesh Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOBI MITRAADS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2018 | Active | Director | 4 September 2018 | 8 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
MITRAKSH MEDIA INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2019 | Active | Director | 11 June 2019 | 1 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Mithlesh Sharma are Shivam Dubey.
FAQ - Mithlesh Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Mithlesh Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Mithlesh Sharma?
The DIN of Mithlesh Sharma is 08214169.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Mithlesh Sharma?
The longest directorship of Mithlesh Sharma is with MOBI MITRAADS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More