MANOJPAL SUGANDH
Manojpal Sugandh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Manojpal Sugandh is 01599763.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Manojpal Sugandh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OK TELESYSTEMS PVT LTD | Trading | 2006 | Active | Director | 31 January 2006 | 9 March 2022 | Buy financial reports |
MEGA FINANCE & SECURITIES LTD. | Finance | 1995 | Active | Director | 2 August 2005 | 7 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Manojpal Sugandh are Romy Sugandh, Sanjay Pal Sugandh.
FAQ - Manojpal Sugandh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Manojpal Sugandh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Manojpal Sugandh?
The DIN of Manojpal Sugandh is 01599763.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Manojpal Sugandh?
The longest directorship of Manojpal Sugandh is with MEGA FINANCE & SECURITIES LTD..
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More