MANJIT ANAND
Manjit Anand is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Manjit Anand is 03070296.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Manjit Anand
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUNGLOW MERCANTILE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 17 July 2019 | 27 April 2021 | Buy financial reports |
MANSYS MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Active | Director | 11 October 2010 | 9 May 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Manjit Anand are Rohit Kohli, Ishmeet Singh Anand, Amit Sharma.
FAQ - Manjit Anand
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Manjit Anand serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Manjit Anand?
The DIN of Manjit Anand is 03070296.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Manjit Anand?
The longest directorship of Manjit Anand is with MANSYS MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More