MANAS PARWANI
Manas Parwani is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Manas Parwani is 06494933.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Real Estate and Renting, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Manas Parwani
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASSET INDIA REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED | Real Estate and Renting | 2012 | Active | Director | 30 July 2019 | 17 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
GROWING WEALTH REALTY LLP | 2013 | Active | Director | 15 June 2013 | 8 August 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Manas Parwani are Ankit Jauhari, Rahul Dixit, Deepa Parwani.
FAQ - Manas Parwani
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Manas Parwani serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Manas Parwani?
The DIN of Manas Parwani is 06494933.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Manas Parwani?
The longest directorship of Manas Parwani is with GROWING WEALTH REALTY LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More