MAMTA SHARMA
Mamta Sharma is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Mamta Sharma is 09716171.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Education, Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Mamta Sharma
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASCLECARE SKILL & DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION | Education | 2022 | Not available for efiling | Director | 25 August 2022 | 26 August 2022 | Buy financial reports |
MAHAGROW GLOBAL PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2022 | Active | Director | 13 September 2022 | 14 September 2022 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Mamta Sharma are Budh Ram, Indra Devi.
FAQ - Mamta Sharma
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Mamta Sharma serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Mamta Sharma?
The DIN of Mamta Sharma is 09716171.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Mamta Sharma?
The longest directorship of Mamta Sharma is with ASCLECARE SKILL & DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More