MALTI JAIN
Malti Jain is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Malti Jain is 00256075.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services etc.
Following are the directorship details of Malti Jain
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOOR EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 1994 | Active | Director | 15 April 2013 | 15 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
RIGIA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 1987 | Active | Director | 14 May 1987 | 20 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Malti Jain are Manish Jain, Ashish Kapila.
FAQ - Malti Jain
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Malti Jain serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Malti Jain?
The DIN of Malti Jain is 00256075.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Malti Jain?
The longest directorship of Malti Jain is with RIGIA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More