MAHIMA MADAN
Mahima Madan is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Mahima Madan is 08143010.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Construction, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Mahima Madan
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVYAAN BUILDTECH LLP | Construction | 2018 | Active | Director | 15 June 2018 | 6 April 2019 | Buy financial reports |
RADHU BUILDERS LLP | 2016 | Active | Director | 25 October 2021 | 2 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Mahima Madan are Nikhil Madan, Akhil Radhu.
FAQ - Mahima Madan
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Mahima Madan serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Mahima Madan?
The DIN of Mahima Madan is 08143010.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Mahima Madan?
The longest directorship of Mahima Madan is with AVYAAN BUILDTECH LLP.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More