LALIT KUMAR SINGHAL
Lalit Kumar Singhal is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Lalit Kumar Singhal is 08424884.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Lalit Kumar Singhal
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHILPWARE PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2022 | Active | Director | 19 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
DOCTOR WONDER PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 18 April 2019 | 20 February 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Lalit Kumar Singhal are Shweta Singhal.
FAQ - Lalit Kumar Singhal
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Lalit Kumar Singhal serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Lalit Kumar Singhal?
The DIN of Lalit Kumar Singhal is 08424884.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Lalit Kumar Singhal?
The longest directorship of Lalit Kumar Singhal is with DOCTOR WONDER PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More