KUSUM KEDIA
Kusum Kedia is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Kusum Kedia is 02498115.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Kusum Kedia
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEDIA SALES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2006 | Active | Director | 20 July 2006 | 30 November 2022 | Buy financial reports |
SRIJAGDAMBA CYLINDER GASES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2013 | Active | Director | 14 December 2017 | 24 February 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Kusum Kedia are Ranjit Kumar Modi, Swati Kedia, Sneha Kedia.
FAQ - Kusum Kedia
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Kusum Kedia serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Kusum Kedia?
The DIN of Kusum Kedia is 02498115.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Kusum Kedia?
The longest directorship of Kusum Kedia is with KEDIA SALES PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More