KUNWAR SINGH
Kunwar Singh is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Kunwar Singh is 08227480.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Business Services, etc.
Following are the directorship details of Kunwar Singh
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVENTURE INFOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED | Business Services | 2015 | Active | Director | 18 January 2019 | 11 June 2022 | Buy financial reports |
AVENTURE INFOTECH LLP | 2023 | Active | Director | 9 May 2023 | 10 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Kunwar Singh are Asha Singh.
FAQ - Kunwar Singh
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Kunwar Singh serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Kunwar Singh?
The DIN of Kunwar Singh is 08227480.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Kunwar Singh?
The longest directorship of Kunwar Singh is with AVENTURE INFOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More