KUNURU SREEDHAR KUMAR
Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar is 03092510.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading etc.
Following are the directorship details of Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALEX TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2010 | Active | Director | 24 June 2010 | 7 May 2023 | Buy financial reports |
WALLIE TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2019 | Active | Director | 24 April 2019 | 7 May 2024 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar are Shila Sagaram Prashanth.
FAQ - Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar?
The DIN of Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar is 03092510.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar?
The longest directorship of Kunuru Sreedhar Kumar is with SALEX TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More